open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01418
    Party Name:Santaella v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Good Standing]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Transfer]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report on Copyright Form]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Re: Chambers Practices]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135675
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =