open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01419
    Party Name:G. F. v. Castillo-Jimenez et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Update Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135671
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =