open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01897
    Party Name:Velez v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?137045
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =