open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00309-1
    Party Name:USA v. Nolan
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USM Return Executed]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Information Sheet]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?79895
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =