open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00292-1
    Party Name:USA v. Burroughs
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Order]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Responsibility]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum ]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Hearing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Surety Information Sheet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for PSI and Report]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Information Sheet]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond ]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?137127
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =