open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:19-32011
    Party Name:Ralph J. Amodei
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?299334
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =