open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:19-32008
    Party Name:Tina Lennette Dais
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?299331
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =