open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:20-cv-01127
    Party Name:Sanchez v. Some Things Fishy, Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?140388
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =