open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:13-50980
    Party Name:Harjibhai Shankerlal Patel and Minaxi Harjibhai Patel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Corrected Amendment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Deficiency Notice - Amendment]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chorches, Ronald I. [Reopen Case Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258691
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =