U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jakups
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • December 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.