U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01072
  • Case Name: Gourd v. Exactech, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Case Transferred Out]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 07, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.