U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01069
  • Case Name: Raleigh v. Baribault et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Pre-Filing Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Response]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 26, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 26, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • September 26, 2024: [Compel]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 07, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order (Self-Rep)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • August 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.