U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01077
  • Case Name: Avery v. Cook Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • September 15, 2022: [Case Transferred Out]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 25, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.