U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01080
  • Case Name: McHugh v. HealthPlanOne, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 25, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 25, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.