U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01081
  • Case Name: Cruz et al v. Signify North America Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 07, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 04, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 04, 2022: [Stay]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.