U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01076
  • Case Name: Pugh v. Manson Youth Institution
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.