U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01082
  • Case Name: Rajkarnikar v. Ernst & Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 14, 2022: [Expedite]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.