U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01091
  • Case Name: Simoniz USA Inc v. J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • August 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 29, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.