U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01106
  • Case Name: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Real Estate Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.