U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01101
  • Case Name: Bradley v. Superior Court of New Haven
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 20, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 17, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 12, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.