U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01111
  • Case Name: Cuttino v. Senior Philanthropy of Newington, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.