U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01110
  • Case Name: Barletta v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • January 09, 2023: [Clarification]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Returning Submission]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Affidavit]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service - Prisoner]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.