U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01107
  • Case Name: Lexis v. Noureka
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • September 02, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.