U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01115
  • Case Name: Pittman v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.