U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01118
  • Case Name: National Association for Gun Rights et al v. Lamont et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 24, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 10, 2022: [Pre-Filing Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.