U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01117
  • Case Name: In re: DeFranco
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 31, 2022: [Bankruptcy Briefing Notice]
  • October 31, 2022: [Bankruptcy Transmittal Form]
  • October 31, 2022: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
  • October 27, 2022: [Bankruptcy Designation Notice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Agreed Statement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Bankruptcy Designation Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [No Designation/Agreed Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Bankruptcy Designation Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Bankruptcy Transmittal Form]
  • September 06, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.