U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01124
  • Case Name: Wilkinson v. Electric Boat Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pre-Filing Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.