U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01114
  • Case Name: Arpino v. Spero et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 09, 2023: [Exhibit]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Recommended Ruling]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling]
  • October 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Recommended Ruling]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.