U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01119
  • Case Name: Dinh v. Boisvert
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Authorization Form]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.