U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01125
  • Case Name: Williams v. Transportation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 06, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Security for Costs]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 15, 2022: [Security for Costs]
  • September 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 07, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.