U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01123
  • Case Name: Ciarleglio v. East Haven et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 06, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.