U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01131
  • Case Name: Helo v. Sema4 Holdings, Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • November 17, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.