U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01128
  • Case Name: Youm et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Stay]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 08, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 08, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.