U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01134
  • Case Name: Manson v. Macy's Corporate Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 21, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 15, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.