U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01135
  • Case Name: Tabak v. Cause ACTION Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Default Entry 55(a)]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 08, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.