U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01137
  • Case Name: Bankwell Bank v. Medlegal LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.