U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01127
  • Case Name: W. v. Foote School Association Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Objection]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objection]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • December 22, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 22, 2022: [Objection]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 12, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • December 12, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 11, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • November 03, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order (Self-Rep)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appearance Self Represented Party]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.