U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01139
  • Case Name: Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2023: [Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Social Security Transcripts]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of New SSA Action]
  • September 09, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.