U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01126
  • Case Name: Librandi v. Alexion Pharmaceuticals Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 14, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 14, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.