U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01159
  • Case Name: Sherman v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2024: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.