U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01151
  • Case Name: Zenquis v. Pullen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Response]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 01, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 15, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.