U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01165
  • Case Name: Nicholson v. Mackenzie et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.