U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01167
  • Case Name: International Supply, LLC et al v. Hudson Meridian Construction Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 15, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.