U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01169
  • Case Name: Young v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 11, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 05, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.