U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01174
  • Case Name: Alkhdair v. Nanavatty et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.