U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01176
  • Case Name: 151 Roberts, LLC v. Hanover Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.