U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01175
  • Case Name: Juice Creative Group, LLC v. UncommonGood, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Exhibit]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Report on Copyright Form]
  • September 26, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 21, 2022: [Requirement to file Copyright Form AO-121]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.