U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01172
  • Case Name: Pina v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.