U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01171
  • Case Name: Card v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Social Security Transcripts]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of New SSA Action]
  • September 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.