U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01181
  • Case Name: Radziwilko v. Element Solutions, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.